Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Taik Maung

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pyay

Titular Bishop of Bocconia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1946 BornNgayokkon
15 Mar 197528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Prome, Myanmar
8 Nov 198437.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Prome, Myanmar
8 Nov 198437.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bocconia
1 Nov 198538.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bocconia
16 Jul 201063.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Pyay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Gregory Taik Maung:
Bishop Gregory Taik Maung (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pyay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pyay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2010
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015