Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tihamér Tóth

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1889Born
27 Jun 191122.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 193849.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
30 May 193849.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Olbia
29 Jun 193849.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olbia
3 Mar 193950.1SucceededBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
6 May 193950.3DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Tihamér Tóth
Bishop Tihamér Tóth (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzolnok

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 229
  • d: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast