Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustachio Palma

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1676BornUrbino
24 Sep 171235.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 171841.5AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
29 May 171841.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
2 Sep 175477.8DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eustachio Palma:
Bishop Eustachio Palma (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1751
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013