Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Ferdinand Van Beughem

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1630BornBruxellen
13 Mar 165524.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 167949.1AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
12 Nov 167949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
19 May 169968.7DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Ferdinand Van Beughem:
Bishop Jean-Ferdinand Van Beughem (died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014