Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Pardo de Tavera

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1472BornToro
14 Jul 151442.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
31 Dec 152351.6AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
8 Jun 152452.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
22 Feb 153158.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 153158.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
27 Apr 153461.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
1 Aug 154573.2DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pardo de Tavera:
Cardinal Juan Pardo de Tavera (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a cardinal for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Feb 1531
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 30, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013