Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Didaco Di Pace

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1661BornNapoli
11 May 171857.0AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
29 May 171857.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
28 Nov 173776.5DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Didaco Di Pace:
Bishop Didaco Di Pace (born , died ) Bishop of Sarno

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015