Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Torti Rogadei, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1668Born
1 Mar 169223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
11 May 171850.0AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
29 May 171850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
9 Dec 172658.6AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
19 Aug 174274.3DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Torti Rogadei
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Torti Rogadei O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOspedaletto

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85, and Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 45
  • bp: CB, 3 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast