Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspard Dubois (Van Den Bosch, Nemius)

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1577BornBuscoducen
17 Mar 161234.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 163557.8AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
22 Jul 163558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
24 Aug 164972.3SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
27 Nov 165174.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
29 Nov 166790.6DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspard Dubois (Van Den Bosch, Nemius):
Archbishop Gaspard Dubois (Van Den Bosch, Nemius) (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 88, and Page 131
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013