Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Felice Marsili

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹BornBologna
5 Dec 170150.9AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
29 Jan 170251.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
5 Jul 171059.5DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Felice Marsili:
Bishop Antonio Felice Marsili (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015