Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alphonse de Berghes

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1624Born
22 May 165025.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 166944.9SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
17 Nov 167046.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
25 Jan 167146.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
7 Jun 168964.7DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Alphonse de Berghes
Archbishop Alphonse de Berghes (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 262
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,524
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast