Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Maria Poggi, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1647BornFlorence
31 May 167023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
19 Feb 170355.7AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
24 Feb 170355.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
14 Apr 171971.9DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Maria Poggi:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Maria Poggi O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 269
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013