Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Menafra

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1659BornBrienza
17 Apr 168324.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 171859.0AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
6 Feb 171859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
Nov 1738³79.8DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Menafra:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Menafra (born , died Nov 1738) Bishop of Acerno

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 66
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,468
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 14
  • bp/ob: CB, 1 Sep 2015
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015