Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre van den Perre

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1619³BornLouvain
12 Mar 165030.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Apr 165030.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 168060.8SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
7 Oct 168061.4ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
5 Jan 168161.6Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
7 Sep 169576.3DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre van den Perre:
Bishop Pierre van den Perre (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015