Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilien Morillon

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517¹Born
24 Jan 158366.0AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
16 Oct 158366.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
27 Mar 158669.2DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximilien Morillon (VIAF: 282158764)
Bishop Maximilien Morillon (born 1517, died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouvain
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast