Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Simons

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538¹Born
3 Sep 158446.6AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
13 Jan 158547.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
5 Oct 160567.7DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Simons (VIAF: 171703729)
Bishop Pierre Simons (born 1538, died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThielt
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceYpres, Diocese of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,519
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast