Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Cirillo

Deceased

Bishop of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1675BornTorre del Grecco
2 Dec 170328.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 171842.9AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
16 Jan 171842.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
14 Feb 172449.0AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
Aug 1745³70.4DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Cirillo:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Cirillo (born , died Aug 1745) Bishop of Teano

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136, and Page 373
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,465
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015