Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomaeus Olivieri

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1642BornCutro
30 Jan 166724.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 169654.0AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
21 Dec 169654.0Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
Aug 1708³65.6DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartholomaeus Olivieri:
Bishop Bartholomaeus Olivieri (born , died Aug 1708) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015