Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantin-Marie-Joseph Chauvin

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1859Born
8 Jun 188222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Laval, France
30 Jul 192060.8AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
28 Oct 192061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
17 Mar 193070.5DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Constantin-Marie-Joseph Chauvin
Bishop Constantin-Marie-Joseph Chauvin (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCossé-le-Vivien

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast