Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Helmut Dieser

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Narona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1962 BornNeuwied
8 Jul 198927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
24 Feb 201148.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
24 Feb 201148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Narona
5 Jun 201149.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Narona

MicroData Summary for Helmut Dieser:
Bishop Helmut Dieser (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,070

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013