Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yousaf Sohan

Bishop of Multan, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1958 Born
3 Jul 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Multan, Pakistan
9 Dec 202264.2AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
2 Feb 202364.4Ordained BishopBishop of Multan, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Yousaf Sohan
(WikiData: Q115647469)
Bishop Yousaf Sohan (born ) Bishop of Multan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLayyaha, Diocese of Multan
Ordained BishopNear, Most Holy Redeemer, Cathedral, Multan, Diocese of Multan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Multan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2022
  • ob: CB, 1 Feb 2023
  • c2+: CB, 2 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 24 May 2023