Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Multan

Dioecesis Multanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Yousaf Sohan, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 20 July 1939
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lahore
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Pakistan
  • Square Kilometers: 98,705 (38,124 Square Miles)
  • Description: In the Multan Division, the districts of Multan, Vehari, Khanewal and Lodhran. In the Bahawalpur Division, the districts of Bahawalnagar, Bahawalnagar and Rahim Yar Khan. In the Dera Ghazi Khan Division the districts of Dera Ghazi Khan, Muzaffargarh, Layyah and Rajanpur
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 133, 63 Aurangzeb Road, Multan Cantt. 60000, Pakistan
  • Telephone: 300.282.5121

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Multan
17 December 1936ErectedDiocese of Lahore (Dera Ghazi Khan with Buoch Trans Frontier, Muzaffargarth, Jhang, Multan, Montgomery, Lyalpur, Dera Ismail Khan, along with BhajŠkar and Bahawalpur) Prefecture Apostolic of Multan (erected)
Diocese of Multan
20 July 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Multan Diocese of Multan
15 July 1950Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Multan (from Delhi and Simla)
8 May 1955Territory LostDiocese of Multan (Dera Ismail and Bhakkar) Diocese of Rawalpindi
13 April 1960Territory LostDiocese of Multan (Lyalipur, Montgomery, and Jhang) Diocese of Lyallpur (erected)
26 March 1994Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Multan (from Karachi)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Multan
195040,10310,026,000.4%20202,0052048ap1951
197023,0997,042,918.3%219211,0993137ap1971
198030,73612,463,000.2%418221,3971324710ap1981
199074,20014,114,000.5%1014243,091154810ap1991
1999115,00031,640,000.4%1216284,107295117ap2000
2000115,00031,640,000.4%1316293,965265017ap2001
2001115,50031,640,456.4%1410244,8122183617ap2002
200298,86531,640,456.3%1013234,298303618ap2003
200399,01531,900,000.3%1111224,50023418ap2004
200499,37532,162,000.3%1015253,97531418ap2005
2013197,74737,487,000.5%1011219,416363019ap2014
2016310,00039,821,000.8%13142711,481454314ap2017
2019300,50038,600,000.8%1616329,3901424615ap2020
2021302,37038,840,650.8%14142810,7981344815ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Multan
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 263, and Page 264
  • Diocese of Multan
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 32, Page 34, to Page 36
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 66, to Page 69
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 86, Page 633, and Page 634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 24 Dec 2023