Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe Zakhia El-Kassis

Apostolic Nuncio to Pakistan

Titular Archbishop of Rosella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1968 Born
21 May 199425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Nov 201850.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Pakistan
24 Nov 201850.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rosella
19 Jan 201950.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rosella

MicroData Summary for Christophe Zakhia El-Kassis
Archbishop Christophe Zakhia El-Kassis (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Pakistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut, Archeparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Pakistan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2018
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Jan 2019

Quantcast