Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastian Francis Shaw, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Lahore, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1957 Born
2 Aug 198931.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
6 Dec 199134.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Feb 200951.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lahore, Pakistan
14 Feb 200951.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
25 Apr 200951.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
14 Nov 201356.0AppointedArchbishop of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Francis Shaw
Archbishop Sebastian Francis Shaw O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Lahore

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadri-Jo-Goth

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lahore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,161
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast