Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Austin, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1930Born
26 May 195625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
23 Jan 197948.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
23 Jan 197948.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Petina
14 Mar 197948.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petina
19 Dec 198555.4AppointedBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
25 Feb 198655.6InstalledBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
2 Jan 200170.5RetiredBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
18 Aug 201888.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Austin, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Edward McCarthy
Bishop John Edward McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Austin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouston, Diocese of Galveston, Texas
Ordained BishopHouston, Diocese of Galveston-Houston, Texas
Death PlaceAustin, Diocese of Austin, Texas

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast