Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joe Steve Vásquez

Bishop of Austin, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1957 BornStamford, TX
30 Jun 198427.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Angelo, Texas, USA
30 Nov 200144.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
30 Nov 200144.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cova
23 Jan 200244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cova
26 Jan 201052.5AppointedBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
8 Mar 201052.7InstalledBishop of Austin, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Joe Steve Vásquez:
Bishop Joe Steve Vásquez (born ) Bishop of Austin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Austin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013