Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Chad William Zielinski

Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1964 Born
8 Jun 199631.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
8 Nov 201450.1AppointedBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
15 Dec 201450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Chad William Zielinski
Bishop Chad William Zielinski (born ) Bishop of Fairbanks

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, MI

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fairbanks.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2014
  • c1/ob: CB, 8 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast