Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward James Burns

Bishop of Juneau, Alaska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1957 BornPittsburgh, PA
25 Jun 198325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Jan 200951.3AppointedBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
3 Mar 200951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
2 Apr 200951.5InstalledBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward James Burns:
Bishop Edward James Burns (born ) Bishop of Juneau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Juneau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,059

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013