Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Patrick Fitzgerald, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Johannesburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1914BornBallyhahill, Ireland
25 May 194026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Aug 196652.5AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
18 Oct 196652.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
24 Jan 197662.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Johannesburg, South Africa
2 Jul 198470.4ResignedBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
16 Feb 198672.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Johannesburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Fitzgerald:
Archbishop Joseph Patrick Fitzgerald O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Johannesburg

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015