Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Georgens

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Titular Bishop of Gubaliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1950 Born
26 Jun 197726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
27 Jan 199544.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
27 Jan 199544.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gubaliana
25 Mar 199544.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gubaliana

MicroData Summary for Otto Georgens
Bishop Otto Georgens (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeisenheim am Berg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Speyer.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast