Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Helmut Bauer

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Velefi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1933 Born
21 Jul 195724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
11 Jul 198855.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
11 Jul 198855.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Velefi
14 Oct 198855.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velefi
18 Mar 200875.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Helmut Bauer
Bishop Helmut Bauer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchimborn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Würzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast