Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ubaldo Ramón Santana Sequera, F.M.I.

Archbishop Emeritus of Maracaibo, Venezuela

Apostolic Administrator of Carora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1941 Born
12 Oct 196827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fils de Marie Immaculée
4 Apr 199048.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
4 Apr 199048.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
27 May 199049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
2 May 199149.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
11 Nov 200059.4AppointedArchbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
24 May 201877.0RetiredArchbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
29 Aug 201978.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Carora, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ubaldo Ramón Santana Sequera
Archbishop Ubaldo Ramón Santana Sequera F.M.I. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maracaibo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagua
Ordained BishopSte. Anne, Cathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maracaibo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,068
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2018
  • aadm: CB, 29 Aug 2109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast