Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan María Leonardi Villasmil

Deceased

Bishop of Punto Fijo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1947BornBocono
4 Aug 197932.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 199446.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela
27 Jan 199446.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
8 Apr 199447.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
12 Jul 199750.4AppointedBishop of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
30 Aug 199750.5InstalledBishop of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
7 Jun 201467.3DiedBishop of Punto Fijo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan María Leonardi Villasmil:
Bishop Juan María Leonardi Villasmil (born , died ) Bishop of Punto Fijo

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,341
  • d: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015