Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Dios Peña Rojas

Bishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1967 BornAcequias
1 Dec 199124.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mérida, Venezuela
22 Aug 199225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mérida, Venezuela
17 Apr 201547.6AppointedBishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela
4 Jul 201547.9Ordained BishopBishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan de Dios Peña Rojas:
Bishop Juan de Dios Peña Rojas (born ) Bishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 17 Apr 2015
  • c2+: CB, 20 Apr 2015
  • c1: CB, 2 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015