Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Nicolás Bermúdez Villamizar, C.I.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Lamsorti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1929 BornRubio
15 Aug 195324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
15 Feb 199767.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 Feb 199767.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
19 Apr 199767.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
17 Jan 200979.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Pedro Nicolás Bermúdez Villamizar:
Bishop Pedro Nicolás Bermúdez Villamizar C.I.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,949
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 12 Sep 2013