Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Jacinto Valente, O. do Cristo †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1707³Born
22 Sep 173124.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 175345.5AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
25 Jul 175346.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
19 Jan 177466.5DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Jacinto Valente
Bishop Pedro Jacinto Valente O. do Cristo (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvora, Portugal
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 239
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast