Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Roberts Rush

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1916Born
18 Mar 193922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Townsville, Australia
7 Nov 196044.1AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
8 Feb 196144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
5 Mar 197356.4AppointedArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
3 Dec 199175.2RetiredArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
21 Jul 200184.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Francis Roberts Rush
(VIAF: 47148389505710712937; WikiData: Q13409357)
Archbishop Francis Roberts Rush (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brisbane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTownsville, Diocese of Rockhampton
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Rockhampton, Diocese of Rockhampton
Death PlaceBrisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1+: AustOceaniaBishops.org
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1961, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 26 May 2023