Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maximilien Cardinal de Fürstenberg

Deceased

Grand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

Cardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1904BornCastle of Ter Worm, Netherlands
9 Aug 193126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
14 Mar 194944.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Paltus
22 Mar 194944.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Japan
25 Apr 194944.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Paltus
28 Apr 195247.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Japan
21 Nov 195955.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Australia
21 Nov 195955.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to New Zealand
28 Apr 196257.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
26 Jun 196762.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio
26 Jun 196762.7Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196762.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
15 Jan 196863.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
Mar 197267.4AppointedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
28 Feb 197368.3ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
22 Sep 198883.9DiedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

MicroData Summary for Maximilien de Fürstenberg:
Maximilien Cardinal de Fürstenberg (born , died ) Grand Master of Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
  • a cardinal for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014