Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Gerry

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia

Titular Bishop of Lugmad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1927Born
21 Dec 195023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
5 Jun 197548.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
5 Jun 197548.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugmad
29 Jul 197548.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lugmad
11 Feb 200375.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
13 Dec 201790.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Gerry
Bishop John Joseph Gerry (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosalie
Death PlaceHoly Spirit, Hospital, Chermside, Archdiocese of Brisbane

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast