Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Michael Howell

Auxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia

Titular Bishop of Thamugadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1958 Born
24 Jun 198325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
28 Mar 201759.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
28 Mar 201759.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
14 Jun 201759.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thamugadi

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Michael Howell
Bishop Kenneth Michael Howell (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brisbane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane
Ordained BishopSt. Stephen's, Cathedral, Brisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Brisbane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Mar 2017
  • c2: CB, 13 Jun 2017
  • c01: CB, 14 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017