Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Brisbane

Archidioecesis Brisbanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mark Benedict Coleridge, Archbishop
  • Joseph John Oudeman, O.F.M. Cap., Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Alexius Bathersby, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Brian Vincent Finnigan, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • John Joseph Gerry, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 May 1887
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 65,000 (25,106 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bne.catholic.net.au/
  • Mailing Address: Francis Rush Centre, 277 Elizabeth Street, Brisbane, QLD 4000; G.P.O. Box 282, Brisbane, QLD 4001, Australia
  • Telephone: (07)3324.3324
  • Fax: 3324.3377

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Brisbane
12 April 1859ErectedArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Brisbane (erected)
1877Territory LostDiocese of Brisbane Vicariate Apostolic of Queensland (erected)
29 December 1882Territory LostDiocese of Brisbane Diocese of Rockhampton (erected)
Archdiocese of Brisbane
10 May 1887ElevatedDiocese of Brisbane Archdiocese of Brisbane
28 May 1929Territory LostArchdiocese of Brisbane Diocese of Toowoomba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Brisbane
1950121,000560,00021.6%142571996085788277ap1951
1952130,000570,00022.8%14765212613561,16888ap1960
1966203,700954,68021.3%1881133016762491,328109ap1967
1968241,5001,067,48022.6%1791182978132671,346105ap1971
1980299,0001,297,00023.1%1891253149523331,557115ap1981
1990428,0001,560,00027.4%2021093111,3762571,045109ap1991
1999550,6032,255,10024.4%1881032911,8921236861112ap2000
2000550,6032,255,10024.4%168922602,1171209829112ap2001
2001550,6032,255,10024.4%163952582,1341219818111ap2002
2002550,6032,255,10024.4%175952702,039216793111ap2003
2003598,7002,529,15423.7%165902552,3472220780112ap2004
2004598,7002,529,15423.7%179972762,1691220768109ap2005
2006621,0002,626,00023.6%156962522,4646227739109ap2007
2012663,0002,849,00023.3%155902452,70615215611103ap2013
2015740,0003,205,00023.1%176942702,74014211542100ap2016

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.7, 31 Aug 2016; Data: 20 Dec 2016