Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Heenan

Bishop Emeritus of Rockhampton


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1937 BornAshgrove
29 Jun 196224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
23 Jul 199154.0AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
25 Sep 199154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
1 Oct 201376.2RetiredBishop of Rockhampton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Brian Heenan:
Bishop Brian Heenan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rockhampton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockhampton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,474
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,551
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014