Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Martin Morris

Bishop Emeritus of Toowoomba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1943 BornBardon
28 Jun 196925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
20 Nov 199249.1AppointedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
10 Feb 199349.3Ordained BishopBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
2 May 201167.6RemovedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Martin Morris:
Bishop William Martin Morris (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Toowoomba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toowoomba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,001
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Mar 2014