Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonard Anthony Faulkner

Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1926 BornBooleroo Centre
195023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Adelaide, Australia
14 Sep 196740.8AppointedBishop of Townsville, Australia
28 Nov 196741.0Ordained BishopBishop of Townsville, Australia
2 Sep 198356.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia
19 Jun 198558.5SucceededArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
3 Dec 200175.0RetiredArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Leonard Anthony Faulkner:
Archbishop Leonard Anthony Faulkner (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Adelaide.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013