Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ernest Putney

Deceased

Bishop of Townsville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1946BornGladstone
28 Jun 196923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
31 May 199548.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
31 May 199548.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mizigi
27 Jul 199549.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mizigi
24 Jan 200154.6AppointedBishop of Townsville, Australia
27 Mar 200154.8InstalledBishop of Townsville, Australia
28 Mar 201467.8DiedBishop of Townsville, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael Ernest Putney:
Bishop Michael Ernest Putney (born , died ) Bishop of Townsville

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Mar 2014