Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Guzmán y Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1864BornSanta María de la Mercedes del Oro
1888¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 190944.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
24 Feb 191045.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
6 Mar 191045.2InstalledBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
20 Jan 191449.1DiedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Guzmán y Sánchez:
Bishop José de Jesús Guzmán y Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013