Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pascual Díaz y Barreto, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1876BornZapopán
189619.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Oct 190327.2IncardinatedPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Dec 192246.4AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
2 Feb 192346.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
28 Feb 192346.6InstalledBishop of Tabasco, México
25 Jun 192953.0AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
28 Jun 192953.0InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
19 May 193659.9DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Pascual Díaz y Barreto:
Archbishop Pascual Díaz y Barreto S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015