Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Amador Velasco y Peña

Deceased

Bishop of Colima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1856BornVilla de la Purificación
12 Nov 187923.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 190347.3AppointedBishop of Colima, México
30 Aug 190347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Colima, México
31 Aug 190347.3InstalledBishop of Colima, México
30 Jun 194993.2DiedBishop of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for José Amador Velasco y Peña:
Bishop José Amador Velasco y Peña (born , died ) Bishop of Colima

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013