Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Preciado y Nieva, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Darién, Panama

Titular Bishop of Tegea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1886Born
23 Jun 191225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 Feb 193447.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
26 Feb 193447.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tegea
31 May 193447.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tegea
9 Jul 195568.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
13 Aug 196376.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Darién, Panama

MicroData Summary for José María Preciado y Nieva
Bishop José María Preciado y Nieva C.M.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Darién

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCadreita, Spain

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast