Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent del Rosario, C.O. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ceylon

Titular Bishop of Thaumacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1770¹BornRaia, India
1795²25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
23 Dec 183666.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ceylon, Sri Lanka
23 Dec 183666.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
9 Dec 183868.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
29 Apr 184272.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Ceylon, Sri Lanka

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent del Rosario
Bishop Vincent del Rosario C.O. (born 1770, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ceylon

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016