Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Devoto

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Attaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1872Born
20 Dec 189523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Sep 192754.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Sep 192754.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Attaea
18 Mar 192855.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attaea
29 Jun 194168.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Devoto
Bishop Fortunato Devoto (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast